Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10106021 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B2 | US2018022194 | 25.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 | WO2016EP52405 | 04.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101968031B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2019 | B1 | KR20170102924 | 12.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 | WO2016EP52405 | 04.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6356355B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | B2 | JP2018504314 | 15.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 | WO2016EP52405 | 04.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107249914B | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | B | CN107249914 | 13.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 | WO2016EP52405 | 04.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3253604 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2018 | B1 | EP3253604 | 13.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 | WO2016EP52405 | 04.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016124700 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015101747 | 03.01.2019 | B4 | DE102015101747 | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015101747 | 06.02.2015 |