EP3250228 - ALUM-CONTAINING COATING FORMULATIONS FOR MICRONEEDLE VACCINE PATCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kindeva Drug Delivery L.P. 42 Water Street, Building 75 St. Paul, MN 55170 / US | [2021/01] |
Former [2017/49] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Peter R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16703201.0 | 18.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016US13773 | Priority number, date | US201562108155P | 27.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562108155 P | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016122915 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3250228 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/39, A61K9/00, A61K47/26, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61M37/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/26 (CN,US);
A61K47/38 (US);
A61K9/0021 (CN,KR,US);
A61K9/06 (KR,US);
A61L31/088 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61M37/0015 (CN,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C08L5/04 (KR);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/575 (US);
A61L2300/102 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/256 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2037/0023 (CN,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMHALTIGE BESCHICHTUNGSFORMULIERUNGEN FÜR MIKRONADELIMPFPFLASTER | [2017/49] | English: | ALUM-CONTAINING COATING FORMULATIONS FOR MICRONEEDLE VACCINE PATCHES | [2017/49] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'ENDUCTION CONTENANT DE L'ALUMINIUM POUR DES VACCINS SOUS FORME DE TIMBRE À MICRO-AIGUILLES | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 27.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2019/14] | 01.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2011150144 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013082418 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | by applicant | US5440446 | US6091975 | US6312612 | US6379324 | US6558361 | US2004049150 | US2004265354 | US6881538 | US2005261631 | US2006195067 | US2008039805 | US7648484 | US2011213335 | US2012123387 | WO2012074576 | WO2012122162 | US8414959 | US2013123707 | US2014006842 |