EP3256257 - GRINDING ROLLER AND METHODS FOR PULLING OFF A STRAP AND SHRINKING A STRAP ONTO THE SHAFT OF THE GRINDING ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHD Humboldt Wedag GmbH Colonia-Allee 3 51067 Köln / DE | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENDLER, Dieter Schifferberg 16 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16703496.6 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016EP52270 | Priority number, date | DE20151001617 | 09.02.2015 Original published format: DE102015001617 | [2017/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016128274 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3256257 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3256257 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/30, B02C4/02 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
B02C4/30 (EP,CN);
B02C4/02 (EP,CN);
B02C4/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAHLWALZE UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABZIEHEN EINER BANDAGE UND AUFSCHRUMPFEN EINER BANDAGE AUF DIE WELLE DER MAHLWALZE | [2017/51] | English: | GRINDING ROLLER AND METHODS FOR PULLING OFF A STRAP AND SHRINKING A STRAP ONTO THE SHAFT OF THE GRINDING ROLLER | [2017/51] | French: | ROULEAU BROYEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE RETRAIT D'UN BANDAGE ET DE RÉTRACTION D'UN BANDAGE SUR L'ARBRE DU ROULEAU BROYEUR | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 17.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2016 | AL | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | IE | 03.02.2019 | LU | 03.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.02.2016 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | LT | 15.08.2018 | |
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | LT | 15.08.2018 | |
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 15.08.2018 | |
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0212882 (WOLVERINE CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * figure - *; | [A]DE19833456 (KOEPPERN & CO KG MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figure - *; | [AD]WO2014012770 (KOEPPERN & CO KG MASCHF [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * figure - *; | [A]DE102014105164 (KÖPPERN GMBH & CO KG MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-7* figure - * |