|
27.07.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
25.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Letter relating to refund instructions (deposit account) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
43 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
31 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |