Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018015421 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510054225 | 03.02.2015 | WO2016EP52175 | 02.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016214449 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510054225 | 03.02.2015 | WO2016EP52175 | 02.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3253473 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510054225 | 03.02.2015 | WO2016EP52175 | 02.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017015044 | 20.03.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN201510054225 | 03.02.2015 | WO2016EP52175 | 02.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016124592 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201510054225 | 03.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105983344B | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B | CN105983344 | 05.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510054225 | 03.02.2015 |