EP3253473 - PERVAPORATION AND VAPOR-PERMEATION SEPARATION METHOD OF GAS-LIQUID MIXTURES AND LIQUID MIXTURES BY ION EXCHANGED SAPO-34 MOLECULAR SIEVE MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Advanced Research Institute Chinese Academy Of Sciences No. 99 Haike Road Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Shanxi Lu'an Environmental Protection&energy Development Co. Ltd. No. 65 Chengbei East Street Changzhi, SHX 046204 / CN | For all designated states Total Raffinage Chimie 2 Place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURULLA-FERRE, Daniel Rue Victor Allard 42 1180 Uccle / BE | 02 /
SUN, Yuhan c/o Shanghai Advanced Research Institute Chinese Academy of Sciences No.99 Haike Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong Shanghai 200120 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Zhiqiang c/o Shanxi Lu'An Environmental Protection&Energy Development Co. Ltd. No. 65 Chengbei East Street Changzhi SHX 046204 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yanfeng c/o Shanghai Advanced Research Institute Chinese Academy of Sciences No.99 Haike Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong Shanghai 200120 / CN | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Mazurelle, Jean Total Research and Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle Feluy C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16703744.9 | 02.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016EP52175 | Priority number, date | CN2015154225 | 03.02.2015 Original published format: CN201510054225 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016124592 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253473 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, B01D61/36, B01D67/00, B01D69/04, B01D69/10, B01D71/02 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B01D61/362 (EP,US);
B01D19/0031 (US);
B01D53/228 (EP,US);
B01D67/0051 (EP,US);
B01D69/04 (EP,US);
B01D69/105 (EP,US);
B01D71/028 (EP,US);
C01B39/54 (EP,US);
C07C29/76 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | DURCHDAMPFUNG UND DAMPFDURCHLÄSSIGKEITSTRENNVERFAHREN FÜR GAS-FLÜSSIGKEITSGEMISCHE UND FLÜSSIGKEITSGEMISCHE MIT EINER IONENAUSGETAUSCHTEN SAPO-34-MOLEKULARSIEBMEMBRAN | [2017/50] | English: | PERVAPORATION AND VAPOR-PERMEATION SEPARATION METHOD OF GAS-LIQUID MIXTURES AND LIQUID MIXTURES BY ION EXCHANGED SAPO-34 MOLECULAR SIEVE MEMBRANE | [2017/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION PAR PERVAPORATION ET PERMÉATION À LA VAPEUR DE MÉLANGE GAZ-LIQUIDE ET DE MÉLANGES DE LIQUIDES PAR MEMBRANE À TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRE SAPO-34 À ÉCHANGE IONIQUE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 03.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011113958 (CARREON MOISES ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [A]US2012006194 (FALCONER JOHN L [US], et al); | [Y]CN103506015 (SHANGHAI ADVANCED RES INST CAS); | [Y]CN103896300 (SHANGHAI ADVANCED RES INST CAS); |