EP3256520 - MODELLING COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C 302 62 Halmstad / SE | [2019/31] |
Former [2017/51] | For all designated states Ramlat Ltd. Tower Gate Place Tal-Qroqq Street Msida, MSD 1703 / MT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THURESSON, Staffan c/o Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C 302 62 Halmstad / SE | 02 /
MODELL, Jonas c/o Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C 302 62 Halmstad / SE | 03 /
THURESSON, Krister c/o Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C 302 62 Halmstad / SE | [2023/25] |
Former [2017/51] | 01 /
THURESSON, Staffan c/o Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C S-302 62 Halmstad / SE | ||
02 /
MODELL, Jonas c/o Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C S-302 62 Halmstad / SE | |||
03 /
THURESSON, Krister c/o Delta of Sweden AB Gjutaregatan 10C S-302 62 Halmstad / SE | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2017/51] | Goddard, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16704268.8 | 15.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016EP53196 | Priority number, date | GB20150002459 | 13.02.2015 Original published format: GB 201502459 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016128582 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3256520 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3256520 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L3/02, C08L3/12, B44C3/04 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
C08K3/30 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
B44C3/04 (BR,GB,KR,RU,US);
C08L3/12 (BR,GB,KR,RU,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,BR,RU,US);
C08K5/0058 (EP,BR,US);
C08K5/053 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
C08K5/07 (BR,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,BR,RU,US);
C08K5/10 (BR,US);
C08K5/101 (EP,BR,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,BR,US);
C08K5/20 (BR,US);
C08L1/284 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (BR,KR,RU);
C08L3/02 (BR,RU);
C08L39/06 (EP,BR,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,BR,KR,US);
C08L99/00 (EP,BR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L99/00, C08K3/30, C08K3/34, C08K5/0058, C08K5/053, C08K5/098, C08K5/101, C08K5/103, C08L1/284, C08L39/06, C08L83/04, C08L99/00 (EP,US);
C08L99/00, C08K3/30, C08K3/34, C08K5/053, C08K5/101, C08K5/103, C08L83/04, C08L99/00 (EP,US);
C08L99/00, C08K3/30, C08K5/053, C08K5/101, C08K5/103, C08L83/04, C08L99/00 (US,EP);
C08L99/00, C08K3/30, C08K5/053, C08K5/101, C08K5/103, C08L99/00 (US,EP);
C08L99/00, C08K3/30, C08K5/053, C08K5/103, C08L99/00 (EP,US);
C08L99/00, C08K5/053, C08K5/101, C08K5/103, C08L99/00 (US,EP);
C08L99/00, C08K5/053, C08K5/101, C08L83/04, C08L99/00 (US,EP);
C08L99/00, C08K5/053, C08K5/101, C08L99/00 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODELLIERMASSE | [2022/35] | English: | MODELLING COMPOUND | [2017/51] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE MODELAGE | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/51] | MODELLIERUNGSVERBINDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 12.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4076547 (LESTER DAVID, et al) [X] 1,2,10-12,16,19-21 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 32; examples 8, 16 * [I] 3-9,13-15,17,18,22-29; | [XI]US5972092 (CORDOVA ABIMAEL [US]) [X] 1-3,10-12,15,16,19-24 * column 6, lines 39-53 * [I] 4-9,13,17,18,25-29; | [XI]WO0159004 (BINNEY & SMITH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,10,11,15,19-22 * page 7(Table); claims 1,5,6 * [I] 4,5,7-9,12-14,16-18,23-29; | [XI]JP2006064982 (NIPPON FLOUR MILLS) [X] 1-3,10-12,15,16,18-20,23,24 * examples 1-10 * [I] 4-9,13,14,17,21,22,25-29; | [XI]CN101298222 (XIAOHONG DONG [CN]) [X] 1-3,5-14,16,18,19,23 * embodiments 1 and 2 * [I] 4,15,17,20-22,24-29; | [XI]EP2172514 (TRENDS2COM BVBA [BE]) [X] 1-4,10,11,15,19 * claims 1-7 * [I] 5-9,12-14,16-18,20-29; | [XI]US2010251934 (SMITH KIMBERLY L [US]) [X] 1-3,9-12,15,16,19 * page 4; table 5 * [I] 4-8,13,14,17,18,20-29; | [XI]US2011014534 (SUNG WOO SUK [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10-13,15,16,19 * claims 4, 14, 18, 19 * [I] 5,7-9,14,17,18,20-29; | [XI]CN102173266 (XIAOHONG DONG) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-14,16,18,19 * see the specific embodiment * [I] 4,9,15,17,20-29; | [XI]KR20120034368 (OH KWEON SUCK [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,5-15,19,20 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 15] , [0 21] - [0027] * [I] 2,4,16-18,21-29; | [XI]CN102975553 (UNIV HUANGSHAN) [X] 1-3,5,10-12,15,16,19-21,23,24 * see the specific embodiment * [I] 4,6-9,13,14,17,18,22,25-29; | [XI]WO2013158510 (ZICKER WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12,15,16,18 * examples 7,11,12 * [I] 4-9,13,14,17,19-29; | [XI]CN103651654 (LIU ZEYUAN) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12,15,16,19,23,24 * embodiment 1 *[I] 4,9,13,14,17,18,20-22,25-29 |