Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3244764 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680016442 CN202410879990 EP16701389 EP16704289 EP23167442 JP2017537968 JP2020151864 KR20177022855 KR20197019673 KR20207028188

More

KR20217034012 US201514598389 US201514598406 US201514598433 US201514598447 US2016013076W US2016013078W US201715847533 US202016800158 US202017080043 US202318114415 US202318135960 US202418908401



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2016115157Global Dossier 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598406 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2025024911Global Dossier 23.01.2025A1
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US202016800158 25.02.2020
US202318114415 27.02.2023
US202418908401 07.10.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023248114Global Dossier 10.08.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202318135960 18.04.2023
US202017080043 26.10.2020
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201715847533 19.12.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9848673Global Dossier 26.12.2017B2
US2016206046 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9820530Global Dossier 21.11.2017B2
US2016206042 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9775401Global Dossier 03.10.2017B2
US2016206039 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514598406 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12121097Global Dossier 22.10.2024B2
US2023200483 29.06.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US202016800158 25.02.2020
US202318114415 27.02.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11659894Global Dossier 30.05.2023B2
US2021037920 11.02.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202017080043 26.10.2020
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201715847533 19.12.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11589644Global Dossier 28.02.2023B2
US2020187591 18.06.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US202016800158 25.02.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10813409Global Dossier 27.10.2020B2
US2018103726 19.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201715847533 19.12.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10568383Global Dossier 25.02.2020B2
US2016206040 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102448764BGlobal Dossier 28.09.2022B1
KR20210129279 27.10.2021A
Priority number Date
KR20207028188 12.01.2016
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102318301BGlobal Dossier 28.10.2021B1
KR20200117057 13.10.2020A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
KR20197019673 12.01.2016
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102163390BGlobal Dossier 08.10.2020B1
KR20190085559 18.07.2019A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102134889BGlobal Dossier 17.07.2020B1
KR20170107006 22.09.2017A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6974565BGlobal Dossier 01.12.2021B2
JP2021006258 21.01.2021A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
JP2017537968 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6763863BGlobal Dossier 30.09.2020B2
JP2018505796 01.03.2018A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4233611Global Dossier 10.01.2024A3
EP4233611 30.08.2023A2
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
EP16704289 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3244763Global Dossier 05.03.2025B1
EP3244763 22.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13078 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118633799Global Dossier 13.09.2024A
Priority number Date
CN201680016442 12.01.2016
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107949289BGlobal Dossier 12.07.2024B
CN107949289 20.04.2018A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3244764Global Dossier 12.04.2023B1
EP3244764 22.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR105811 15.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1249376 02.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2017009332 11.12.2017A
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
WO2016US13076 12.01.2016
US201514598406 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI692319B 01.05.2020B
TW201633942 01.10.2016A
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598406 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI750625B 21.12.2021B
TW202027638 01.08.2020A
Priority number Date
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598406 16.01.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016115156Global Dossier 04.01.2018A8
WO2016115156 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514598389 16.01.2015
US201514598433 16.01.2015
US201514598406 16.01.2015
US201514598447 16.01.2015
TypeType Divisional application
 EP4233611