EP3262737 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR PARTIAL ELECTRONICS INTEGRATION IN VEHICLE PADS FOR WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WiTricity Corporation 57 Water Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2019/15] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEELING, Nicholas Athol 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BEAVER, Jonathan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
VAN BOHEEMEN, Edward Leonardus 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
KISSIN, Michael Le Gallais 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
HUANG, Chang-Yu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
BUDHIA, Mickel Bipin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16704776.0 | 02.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016US16115 | Priority number, date | US201562126356P | 27.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562126356 P | US201514861905 | 22.09.2015 Original published format: US201514861905 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016137684 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3262737 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/10, B60L11/18 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B60L53/122 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (KR,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60L53/124 (EP,US);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L53/38 (EP,KR,US);
B60L55/00 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/12 (KR);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/0042 (KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H01F21/02 (US);
H02J2207/20 (KR,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEILWEISEN ELEKTRONIKINTEGRATION IN FAHRZEUGPADS FÜR ANWENDUNGEN ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2018/01] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR PARTIAL ELECTRONICS INTEGRATION IN VEHICLE PADS FOR WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER APPLICATIONS | [2018/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL D'INTÉGRATION PARTIELLE D'ÉLECTRONIQUE DANS DES PLOTS DE VÉHICULE POUR APPLICATIONS DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 12.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US7149096 (BATARSEH ISSA [US], et al) [Y] 9,14,19,27* column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 8 *; | [XY]JP2007252027 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,5,10,20-24,29 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,7-9,12-14,17-19,25-27; | [Y]WO2007139401 (BOYS JOHN TALBOT [NZ]) [Y] 8,13,18,26 * page 7, line 4 - page 9, line 16; figures 1-17 *; | [XY]EP2345553 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,15,16,20-24,28-30 * paragraphs [0007] - [0032] - [0064] , [0072] - [0085] - [0097] - [0099] - [0109] , [0128] - [0129]; figures 1-17 * [Y] 3,7-9,12-14,17-19,25-27; | [Y]WO2013141717 (COVIC GRANT ANTHONY [NZ], et al) [Y] 7,12,17,25 * paragraph [0043]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2014015328 (BEAVER JONATHAN [NZ], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,12,17,25 * paragraph [0095]; figures 7-18 *; | [Y]US2014015522 (WIDMER HANSPETER [CH], et al) [Y] 7,12,17,25 * paragraph [0266] - paragraph [0267]; figures 25e, 25f *; | [XY]EP2763149 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,15,16,20-24,28-30 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0172]; figures 13-29 * [Y] 3,7-9,12-14,17-19,25-27; | [XY]EP2763148 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,15,16,20-24,28-30 * paragraphs [0036] - [0047] - [0 77] - [0087]; figures 1,6,7 * [Y] 3,7-9,12-14,17-19,25-27 |