EP3262733 - VARIABLE FEED-OUT ENERGY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP, Peerapol 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ATTAR, Rashid Ahmed Akbar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Shengbo 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16704971.7 | 25.01.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016US14668 | Priority number, date | US201562120239P | 24.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562120239 P | US201514925592 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: US201514925592 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016137619 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3262733 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14, H02J13/00, H02J3/38 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H02J3/38 (EP,US);
H02J3/14 (EP,CN,US);
G05B19/048 (US);
H02J13/00 (EP,CN,US);
H02J13/00004 (EP,US);
H02J13/00017 (EP,US);
H02J3/008 (CN);
H02J3/381 (CN);
H02J3/46 (CN);
G05B2219/2639 (US);
H02J2310/12 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERWALTUNG MIT VARIABLER AUSSPEISUNG | [2018/01] | English: | VARIABLE FEED-OUT ENERGY MANAGEMENT | [2018/01] | French: | GESTION D'ÉNERGIE À SORTIE VARIABLE | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 23.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010017045 (NESLER CLAY G [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] *; | [I]US8548637 (LENOX CARL J S [US]) [I] 1-44 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2660943 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0070] * |