EP3258969 - IMMUNOCONJUGATES FOR SPECIFIC INDUCTION OF T CELL CYTOTOXICITY AGAINST A TARGET CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DZIADEK, Sebastian Elilandstrasse 2 83671 Benediktbeuern / DE | 02 /
LIFKE, Alexander Saalangerstrasse 36 82377 Penzberg / DE | 03 /
LIFKE, Valeria Saalangerstrasse 36 82377 Penzberg / DE | 04 /
HILLRINGHAUS, Lars Schönrain 9A 82549 Königsdorf-Schönrain / DE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16705139.0 | 17.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016EP53332 | Priority number, date | EP20150155598 | 18.02.2015 Original published format: EP 15155598 | EP20150199306 | 10.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15199306 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016131856 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258969 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3258969 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/50 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
A61K47/6811 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/65 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/08 (IL,RU);
A61K47/642 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL);
A61P37/08 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2818 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2896 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K19/00 (IL,RU);
A61K2039/505 (IL,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/627 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNKONJUGATE FÜR DIE SPEZIFISCHE INDUKTION VON T-ZELLZYTOTOXIZITÄT GEGEN EINE ZIELZELLE | [2017/52] | English: | IMMUNOCONJUGATES FOR SPECIFIC INDUCTION OF T CELL CYTOTOXICITY AGAINST A TARGET CELL | [2017/52] | French: | IMMUNOCONJUGUÉS POUR L'INDUCTION SPÉCIFIQUE DE CYTOTOXICITÉ DES LYMPHOCYTES T CONTRE UNE CELLULE CIBLE | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2016 | AL | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 17.02.2016 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9945954 (EPIMMUNE INC [US]); | [I]WO0012706 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | [XA]WO2005066203 (AVENTIS PASTEUR INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2009051555 (AKADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS LEIDEN [NL], et al); | [X]WO2014096015 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | by applicant | EP0659439 | EP0659437 | EP1396501 |