EP3251370 - METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING VIDEO SEGMENTS AND DISPLAYING OPTION TO VIEW FROM AN ALTERNATIVE SOURCE AND/OR ON AN ALTERNATIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSCAPE DATA, INC. 39 Tesla Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMEIER, Zeev 39 Tesla Irvine, California 92618 / US | 02 /
COLLETTE, Michael 39 Tesla Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Graham, Emma Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16705381.8 | 29.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016US15681 | Priority number, date | US201562110024P | 30.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562110024 P | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016123495 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251370 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/234, H04N21/472, H04N21/4722, H04N21/658 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
H04N21/23418 (EP,US);
H04N21/23439 (US);
H04N21/44008 (US);
H04N21/472 (US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/47217 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON VIDEOSEGMENTEN UND ANZEIGE DER ANSICHTSOPTION AUS EINER ALTERNATIVEN QUELLE UND/ODER AUF EINER ALTERNATIVEN VORRICHTUNG | [2017/49] | English: | METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING VIDEO SEGMENTS AND DISPLAYING OPTION TO VIEW FROM AN ALTERNATIVE SOURCE AND/OR ON AN ALTERNATIVE DEVICE | [2017/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION DE SEGMENTS VIDÉO ET D'AFFICHAGE D'UNE OPTION DE VISUALISATION À PARTIR D'UNE SOURCE DE SUBSTITUTION ET/OU SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE SUBSTITUTION | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 17.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2019 | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/12] | 08.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 29.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010125870 (UKAWA SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2010306805 (NEUMEIER ZEEV [US], et al); |