EP3254096 - AN ORGANIC TRANSISTOR-BASED SYSTEM FOR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MONITORING OF CELLS AND METHOD FOR THE MONITORING OF THE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI Via San Giorgio 12 09124 Cagliari / IT | For all designated states Universita' degli Studi di Genova Via Balbi, 5 16126 Genova / IT | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEDESCO, MariaTeresa Corso Torino 20/7 I-16129 Genova / IT | 02 /
BONFIGLIO, Annalisa Via Belvedere 30/2 I-16040 Leivi (GE) / IT | 03 /
SPANU, Andrea Via del Sestante 16 I-09126 Cagliari / IT | 04 /
LAI, Stefano Via Salvatore Mannironi 7 I-09134 Cagliari / IT | 05 /
MARTINOIA, Sergio Via Zara 32/4 I-16145 Genova / IT | 06 /
COSSEDDU, Piero Via della Pineta 44 I-09125 Cagliari / IT | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Montevecchi, Emma Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi 18 35122 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2017/50] | Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16705451.9 | 04.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016EP52433 | Priority number, date | IT2015MI00145 | 04.02.2015 Original published format: IT MI20150145 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016124714 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254096 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3254096 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/414, G01N33/483 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G01N27/4145 (EP,US);
G01N33/4833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCHES TRANSISTORBASIERTES SYSTEM FÜR ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHE ÜBERWACHUNG VON ZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER ZELLEN | [2017/50] | English: | AN ORGANIC TRANSISTOR-BASED SYSTEM FOR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MONITORING OF CELLS AND METHOD FOR THE MONITORING OF THE CELLS | [2017/50] | French: | SYSTÈME A TRANSISTOR ORGANIQUE POUR SURVEILLANCE ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUE DE CELLULES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DES CELLULES | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 31.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2016 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | IE | 04.02.2019 | LU | 04.02.2019 | MT | 04.02.2019 | FR | 26.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.02.2016 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
FR | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
FR | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
FR | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
FR | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
FR | 26.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012265474 (REARICK TODD [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0500]; figure 33 *; | [AP] - A. SPANU ET AL, "An organic transistor-based system for reference-less electrophysiological monitoring of excitable cells", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150306), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/srep08807, page 8807, XP055270981 [AP] 1-26 * abstract * * page 6, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 6, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep08807 | [A] - S. LAI ET AL, "Ultralow Voltage, OTFT-Based Sensor for Label-Free DNA Detection", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20130104), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1002/adma.201202996, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 103 - 107, XP055222313 [A] 1-16 * page 103, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 105, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * * page 106, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 107, column 1, paragraph 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201202996 | [A] - LAMBACHER A ET AL, "Electrical imaging of neuronal activity by multi-transistor-array (MTA) recording at 7.8 mum resolution", APPLIED PHYSICS A: MATERIALS SCIENCE & PROCESSING, SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL, DE, (20041101), vol. A79, no. 7, ISSN 0947-8396, pages 1607 - 1611, XP002467452 [A] 17-19,21 * abstract * * page 1607, column right, paragraph 1 - page 1609, column left, paragraph 1; figures 3,4 * | [A] - ZECK G ET AL, "Noninvasive neuroelectronic interfacing with synaptically connected snail neurons immobilized on a semiconductor chip", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20010828), vol. 98, no. 18, doi:10.1073/PNAS.181348698, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10457 - 10462, XP002305989 [A] 23,24 * page 10457, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 10459, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.181348698 | [A] - MONIA DEMELAS ET AL, "Charge sensing by organic charge-modulated field effect transistors: application to the detection of bio-related effects", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY B, GB, (20130101), vol. 1, no. 31, doi:10.1039/c3tb20237b, ISSN 2050-750X, page 3811, XP055222324 [A] 7,22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3tb20237b | [A] - STEFANO LAI ET AL, "Ultralow Voltage Pressure Sensors Based on Organic FETs and Compressible Capacitors", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20130601), vol. 34, no. 6, doi:10.1109/LED.2013.2257660, ISSN 0741-3106, pages 801 - 803, XP011510844 [A] 5,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LED.2013.2257660 | [AP] - FABRIZIO ANTONIO VIOLA ET AL, "Flexible temperature sensors based on charge modulated organic thin film transistors", 2015 11TH CONFERENCE ON PH.D. RESEARCH IN MICROELECTRONICS AND ELECTRONICS (PRIME), (20150601), doi:10.1109/PRIME.2015.7251389, ISBN 978-1-4799-8229-5, pages 278 - 281, XP055271239 [AP] 6,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PRIME.2015.7251389 | by applicant | - SIMON D. T. ET AL., NATURE MATERIAL, (2009), vol. 8, pages 742 - 746 | - KHODAGHOLY ET AL., NATURE COMMUNICATION, (2013), vol. 4 | - BENFENATI ET AL., NATURE MATERIAL, (2013), vol. 12, pages 672 - 680 | - LAI, S.; COSSEDDU, P.; GAZZADI, G. C.; BARBARO, M.; BONFIGLIO, A, "Towards high frequency performances of ultra-low voltage OTFTs: Combining self-alignment and hybrid, nanosized dielectrics", ORGANIC ELECTRONICS, (2013), vol. 14, pages 754 - 761 | - SIMPSON, P, "Stimulation of hypertrophy of cultured neonatal rat heart cells through an alpha 1-adrenergic receptor and induction of beating through an alpha 1- and beta 1-adrenergic receptor interaction. Evidence for independent regulation of growth and beating", CIRC. RES., (1985), vol. 56, pages 884 - 894 | - YONEMOCHI, H.; SAIKAWA, T.; TAKAKURA, T.; ITO, S.; TAKAKI, R, "Effects of calcium antagonist on l3-receptors of cultured cardiac myocytes isolated from neonatal rat ventricle", CIRCULATION, (1990), vol. 81, pages 1401 - 1408 | - DARROW, B. J.; FAST, V. G.; KTEBER, A. G.; BEYER, E. C.; SAFFITZ, J. E, "Increased Conduction Velocity and Enhanced Connexin Expression in Dibutyryl cAMP-Treated Cultured Cardiac Myocytes", CIRC. RES, (1996), vol. 79, pages 174 - 183 |