|
30.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Incoming fax related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Incoming fax related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
04.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |