Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10739304 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B2 | US2018031520 | 01.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP52433 | 04.02.2016 | ITMI20150145 | 04.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3254096 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2018 | B1 | EP3254096 | 13.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP52433 | 04.02.2016 | ITMI20150145 | 04.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016124714 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20150145 | 04.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20150145 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20150145 | 04.02.2015 |