EP3272103 - COEXISTENCE OF SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORK, NETWORK FUNCTION VIRTUALIZATION AND LEGACY NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG St.-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 Munich / DE | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Klaus Franz Sperrweg 51 80995 Munich / DE | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Borgström, Markus Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG T&I IPR Patent Administration St.-Martin-Straße 76 80240 München / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 16705920.3 | 17.02.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016EP53364 | Priority number, date | WO2015EP55940 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: PCT/EP2015/055940 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016150623 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272103 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/64 (US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (US);
H04W28/084 (EP,US);
H04W28/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | H04L29/08, H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | KOEXISTENZ VON SOFTWAREDEFINIERTEM NETZWERK, NETZWERKFUNKTIONSVIRTUALISIERUNG UND ALT-NETZWERKEN | [2018/04] | English: | COEXISTENCE OF SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORK, NETWORK FUNCTION VIRTUALIZATION AND LEGACY NETWORKS | [2018/04] | French: | COEXISTENCE ENTRE UN RÉSEAU DÉFINI PAR LOGICIEL, UNE VIRTUALISATION DE FONCTION DE RÉSEAU ET DES RÉSEAUX HÉRITÉS | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014202151 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]); |