|
30.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
158 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
159 |
|
28.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
158 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
159 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
198 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
31.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
38 |
|
04.05.2017 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
04.05.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.02.2017 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.02.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.12.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
31 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
34 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
199 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
187 |
|
27.06.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
20.04.2016 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
31 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
103 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
51 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |