EP3256754 - BALANCING DEVICE FOR A MACHINE WITH ROTATABLE DRUM, AND MACHINE INCLUDING A ROTATABLE DRUM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMNC Innovations 10B Rue Solférino 92170 Vanves / FR | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSAOUDI, Ali 70 avenue de Verdun 92320 Châtillon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | 01 /
MESSAOUDI, Ali 4 Rue de Tannebourg 94170 Le Perreux sur Marne / FR | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16707898.9 | 11.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016FR50308 | Priority number, date | FR20150051207 | 13.02.2015 Original published format: FR 1551207 | [2017/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016128681 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3256754 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/36, D06F37/22 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
D06F37/225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F16F15/366 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Title | German: | AUSWUCHTVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MASCHINE MIT DREHTROMMEL UND MASCHINE MIT EINER DREHTROMMEL MIT SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG | [2017/51] | English: | BALANCING DEVICE FOR A MACHINE WITH ROTATABLE DRUM, AND MACHINE INCLUDING A ROTATABLE DRUM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2017/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EQUILIBRAGE POUR UNE MACHINE A TAMBOUR ROTATIF ET MACHINE COMPRENANT UN TAMBOUR ROTATIF EQUIPE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 06.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2010029112 (CARNEHAMMAR LARS BERTIL [CH], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,7,9; | [I]WO2013087722 (CARNEHAMMAR PROF DR LARS BERTIL [CH]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011120192 (SONG CHANG MIN [KR]) [A] 1,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2695047 (RUCK JOHN F) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1634986 | WO2010029112 | WO2013087722 |