EP3262012 - A PHOTOCATALYTIC CONCRETE PRODUCT AND A METHOD TO PRODUCE A PHOTOCATALYTIC CONCRETE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photocat A/S Langebjerg 4 4000 Roskilde / DK | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Henrik Safirvej 10 3650 Ølstykke / DK | 02 /
REENBERG, Theis c/o Photocat A/S Langebjerg 4 4000 Roskilde / DK | 03 /
ØSTERGAARD, Simon Lausten Jægersborggade 44 3.th. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/09] | 01 /
JENSEN, Henrik Safirvej 10 3650 Ølstykke / DK | ||
02 /
REENBERG, Theis Jægersborggade 49 3.sal 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | |||
03 /
ØSTERGAARD, Simon Lausten Jægersborggade 44 3.th. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | |||
04 /
REENBERG, Theis Oehlenschlægersgade 3.4 1663 Copenhagen / DK | |||
Former [2018/01] | 01 /
JENSEN, Henrik Safirvej 10 3650 Ølstykke / DK | ||
02 /
REENBERG, Theis Jægersborggade 49 3.sal 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | |||
03 /
ØSTERGAARD, Simon Lausten Jægersborggade 44 3.th. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2020/14] |
Former [2018/01] | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 16708352.6 | 26.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016DK50054 | Priority number, date | DK20150070114 | 27.02.2015 Original published format: DK 201570114 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016134728 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3262012 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3262012 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3262012 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/00, C04B41/50, C04B41/87, B01J21/06, B01J35/00, B01J37/02, B01D53/86, B01D53/88, // C04B111/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B01J21/063 (EP,CN,US);
C04B41/65 (CN,US);
B01D53/8625 (CN);
B01D53/8637 (EP,US);
B01D53/8687 (EP,US);
B01D53/88 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (CN,US);
B01J35/23 (US);
B01J35/39 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/45 (EP,CN);
B01J37/0219 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/30 (CN);
C04B41/009 (EP,CN,US);
C04B41/5041 (EP,CN,US);
C04B41/87 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/802 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2255/9202 (EP,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,US);
B01D2258/06 (EP,US);
C02F2305/10 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (CN,EP,US);
C04B41/5041, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4549, C04B41/4578 (US,EP);
C04B41/5041, C04B41/4549, C04B41/4578, C04B41/4539 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | C04B41/00, C04B41/45, C04B41/50, B01J21/06, B01J35/00, C04B111/00, C04B103/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOTOKATALYTISCHES BETONPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FOTOKATALYTISCHEN BETONPRODUKTS | [2018/01] | English: | A PHOTOCATALYTIC CONCRETE PRODUCT AND A METHOD TO PRODUCE A PHOTOCATALYTIC CONCRETE PRODUCT | [2018/01] | French: | PRODUIT PHOTOCATALYTIQUE DE BÉTON ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT PHOTOCATALYTIQUE DE BÉTON | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 27.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.06.2020 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2016 | AL | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MK | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010110726 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al); | [Y]WO2014168576 (VÄLINGE PHOTOCATALYTIC AB [SE]) |