EP3265964 - ESTIMATING TEMPERATURE VALUES AT FIELD LEVEL BASED ON LESS GRANULAR DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Climate Corporation 201 Third Street, Suite 1100 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINNON, Karen 201 Third Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 02 /
HOYER, Stephan 201 Third Street Suite 1100 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16710592.3 | 04.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016US21050 | Priority number, date | US201514640900 | 06.03.2015 Original published format: US201514640900 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016144818 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265964 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/04, G06Q50/02 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G01W1/00 (US);
G06Q50/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | BEWERTUNG VON TEMPERATURWERTEN AUF FELDEBENE AUF BASIS VON WENIGER GRANULÄREN DATEN | [2018/02] | English: | ESTIMATING TEMPERATURE VALUES AT FIELD LEVEL BASED ON LESS GRANULAR DATA | [2018/02] | French: | ESTIMATION DE VALEURS DE TEMPÉRATURE SUR LE TERRAIN EN FONCTION DE DONNÉES MOINS GRANULAIRES | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 29.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2020 | 03.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 01.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed |