08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
03.01.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
06.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
25.01.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.01.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.01.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.06.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
07.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
12.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
19.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|