13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
12.03.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
17.04.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
03.04.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.11.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
03.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.05.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2019 |
First examination report |
|
31.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
01.06.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
18.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
29.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
12.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
20.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|