EP3271200 - TRANSPORTATION REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH MULTIPLE COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENF, JR., Raymond L. Carrier Transicold Kinne Street Building Tr-19 East Syracuse, New York 13057 / US | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2018/04] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16712620.0 | 15.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US22404 | Priority number, date | US201562135877P | 20.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562135877 P | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153841 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271200 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3271200 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, F25D11/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
B60H1/3223 (EP,CN,US);
F25B31/00 (US);
B60H1/323 (EP,CN,US);
B60H1/3232 (EP,CN,US);
F25B27/00 (EP,US);
F25D11/003 (EP,US);
F25B2327/001 (EP,US);
F25B2400/054 (US);
F25B2400/0751 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTKÜHLEINHEIT MIT MEHREREN KOMPRESSOREN | [2018/04] | English: | TRANSPORTATION REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH MULTIPLE COMPRESSORS | [2018/04] | French: | UNITÉ DE RÉFRIGÉRATION DE TRANSPORT AVEC COMPRESSEURS MULTIPLES | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 30.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2022 | 19.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29816787U (WAECO WAEHNING & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,11,13,16-18* pages 4-6; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2008079128 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15 * pages 4-9; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2009048464 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12-14,18,19 * pages 3-5; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2960949 (SAROUL PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,11,13,16,17 * pages 6,7; figures 2,3 * |