EP3278574 - DUAL DIAPHRAGM MICROPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Hyun Jin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | 01 /
PARK, Hyun Jin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16712626.7 | 15.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016US22493 | Priority number, date | US201514675384 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: US201514675384 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016160327 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3278574 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R19/04, H04R3/00 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
H04R19/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04R7/02 (KR,US);
H04R1/08 (KR,US);
H04R1/222 (KR,US);
H04R19/005 (KR,US);
H04R23/006 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | MIKROFON MIT DOPPELMEMBRAN | [2018/06] | English: | DUAL DIAPHRAGM MICROPHONE | [2018/06] | French: | MICROPHONE À DOUBLE MEMBRANE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 24.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5363452 (ANDERSON C ROGER [US]) [A] 1-30 * column 4, lines 8-68; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0782371 (TIBBETTS INDUSTRIES [US]) [A] 1-30* column 5, lines 3-46; figure 4a *; | [XI]US7840020 (MILLER III SCOTT ALLAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-16,22-27 * column 21, lines 29-64 * * column 21, line 65 - column 22, line 24 * * figure 11 * [I] 5,6,9,17-21,28-30; | [A]US2014270275 (NIEDZWIEDZ CHRISTOPHER ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027]; figures 1-2 * |