EP3277621 - ENERGY GENERATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKLIN, Steven Ernest c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GERHARDT, Lutz Christian c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
POTZE, Willem c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KROES, Hans c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
JOHNSON, Mark Thomas c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16712895.8 | 31.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016EP57029 | Priority number, date | EP20150161937 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15161937 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156471 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277621 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277621 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B81B5/00, B81B3/00, H02N1/04 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
H02N1/04 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B81B3/0056 (CN);
B81B5/00 (CN);
F03B13/10 (US);
F03B3/126 (US);
Y02E10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2018/06] | English: | ENERGY GENERATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 18.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2016 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | IE | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | LU | 31.03.2019 | MT | 31.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 31.03.2016 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 31.03.2016 | |
AL | 31.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD] - LONG LIN ET AL, "Noncontact Free-Rotating Disk Triboelectric Nanogenerator as a Sustainable Energy Harvester and Self-Powered Mechanical Sensor", ACS APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, (20140226), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1021/am405637s, ISSN 1944-8244, pages 3031 - 3038, XP055212372 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/am405637s |