EP3274623 - VEHICLE LIGHT ASSEMBLY AND LIGHTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bentley Motors Limited Pym's Lane Crewe, Cheshire CW1 3PL / GB | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, SangYup 32 Curzon Park North Chester Cheshire CH4 8AR / GB | 02 /
LEARY, David Moss Villa Tilstock Road Whitchurch SY13 3JQ / GB | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16712978.2 | 22.02.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016GB50435 | Priority number, date | GB20150003233 | 26.02.2015 Original published format: GB 201503233 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016135461 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3274623 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3274623 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/48, G02B6/00, F21Y105/00, F21Y101/00, F21Y105/10, F21Y115/10, F21S43/14, F21S43/241, F21S43/245, F21S43/249 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0052 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0011 (GB,US);
B29D11/00663 (US);
B60Q1/00 (GB);
B60Q1/04 (US);
B60Q1/2696 (US);
B60Q1/28 (EP,US);
F21S10/005 (GB);
F21S41/00 (GB);
F21S41/14 (GB);
F21S41/141 (GB,US);
F21S41/24 (GB,US);
F21S41/32 (US);
F21S43/00 (GB);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/241 (EP,US);
F21S43/245 (EP,US);
F21S43/249 (EP,US);
F21S43/40 (US);
B60Q2400/30 (EP,US);
B60Q2400/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | F21S8/10, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/48, G02B6/00, F21Y105/00, F21Y101/00, F21Y105/10, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLICHTANORDNUNG UND BELEUCHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/05] | English: | VEHICLE LIGHT ASSEMBLY AND LIGHTING METHOD | [2018/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 22.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23172412.1 / EP4219235 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | IT | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5709453 (KRENT EDWARD D [US], et al) [A] 2,4,14,17 * figure 6 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 26 *; | [A]FR2776251 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,2,17,18,21-23 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 4, line 29 *; | [A]US6789929 (DOONG TAIR JIUH [TW], et al) [A] 21-23 * figures 1-6 * * column 3, lines 54-63 *; | [YA]JP2005122946 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 9,11,12 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0017] * [A] 8; | [A]DE102006016656 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 8,9,17 * figures 1,2; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]DE102008021902 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 4,5,8 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 11] , [0021] , [0 25] * * figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2407709 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 21-23 * figure 3; claim 18 *; | [X]JP2012064535 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,15,16,21-23 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2012170301 (VERHEE PATRICK [DE]) [Y] 24-29 * figures 1-5; claims 1-12 * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0041] , [0042] *; | [XYI]EP2543925 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,7,13,14,18,20,21,23,34 * figures 1-6; claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 26] , [0 33] , [0 58] * [Y] 4,5,8,17 [I] 2,15,16,19,30,33; | [XA]DE102011051541 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,21-23 * abstract * [A] 15,16; | [XYI]JP2013048036 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,13,14,18,20-23,34 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 28] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 9,11,12,24-29 [I] 17,19,30-33; | [A]EP2567866 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 24-29 * paragraphs [0021] , [0025] * * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2013077337 (RUPAR ERNESTO [DE], et al) [A] 21-23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2596992 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 24-29* abstract *; | [A]US2014321139 (BUNGENSTOCK CARMEN [DE], et al) [A] 24-29 * figures 1-20; claims 1,2 * * paragraph [0009] *; | [YA]FR3008775 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [Y] 17 * page 3, lines 15-27 * * page 1-; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,4,5,18,21-23 | Examination | JP2005056623 | EP2980472 |