Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10389074 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2019 | B2 | US2018131149 | 10.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111355346B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2022 | B | CN111355346 | 30.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201680016883 | 30.03.2016 | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107408813 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2982666 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2020 | C | CA2982666 | 20.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251181 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | B1 | EP3251181 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017021933 | 04.10.2022 | B1 | BR112017021933 | 03.07.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2772827T | 08.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56905 | 30.03.2016 | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016165939 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3082202 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15164054 | 17.04.2015 |