08.09.2023 |
Refusal of application |
published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
22.05.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
27.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2023 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.10.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.04.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.04.2021 |
First examination report |
|
25.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
01.06.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
15.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
05.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
12.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|