Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10354524 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2019 | B2 | US2018165956 | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56893 | 30.03.2016 | DE102015104940 | 31.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3278318 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP56893 | 30.03.2016 | DE102015104940 | 31.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016156377 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015104940 | 31.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015104940 | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015104940 | 31.03.2015 |