EP3265705 - ASSEMBLY FOR THE FLUIDIC CONTROL OF A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes de Controle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Nicolas 14 avenue Massena 2ème étage 78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR | 02 /
HODEBOURG, Grégory 29 rue Lebon 78500 Sartrouville / FR | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Garcia, Christine Propriété Intellectuelle Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14, avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy St Christophe / FR | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16713961.7 | 02.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016FR50473 | Priority number, date | FR20150051779 | 03.03.2015 Original published format: FR 1551779 | [2018/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016139420 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265705 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/052 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
F16K11/052 (EP);
F02M26/26 (EP);
F16K1/221 (EP);
F16K31/521 (EP);
F16K31/5282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR FLUIDISCHEN STEUERUNG EINES VENTILS | [2018/02] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR THE FLUIDIC CONTROL OF A VALVE | [2018/02] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE RÉGULATION FLUIDIQUE D'UNE VANNE | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 06.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YDA]FR3004503 (VALEO SYS CONTROLE MOTEUR SAS [FR]) [YD] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [A] 3-8,10-12; | [Y]US2008061260 (O'SHEA TIMOTHY M [US]) [Y] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *; | [A]US1797118 (BEACH GEORGE F) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR3004503 |