|
22.12.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
01.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
19 |
|
28.02.2017 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
28.02.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.01.2017 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.01.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
19.01.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
10.06.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
10.06.2016 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
40 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |