Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10933430 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2021 | B2 | US2018078948 | 22.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15179568 | 03.08.2015 | DE102015104168 | 19.03.2015 | WO2016IB51481 | 16.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107427839B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B | CN107427839 | 01.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15179568 | 03.08.2015 | DE102015104168 | 19.03.2015 | WO2016IB51481 | 16.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3271077 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2021 | B1 | EP3271077 | 24.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15179568 | 03.08.2015 | DE102015104168 | 19.03.2015 | WO2016IB51481 | 16.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015104168 | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015104168 | 19.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016147127 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15179568 | 03.08.2015 | DE102015104168 | 19.03.2015 |