EP3273953 - STABLE FORMULATION FOR PARENTERAL ADMINISTRATION OF TAPENTADOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHILLER, Marc Max-Pechstein-Straße 4 52076 Aachen / DE | 02 /
VAN HEMELRIJCK, Carlos Theaterstraße 49 52062 Aachen / DE | 03 /
STRAUB, Stefanie Erzweg 8a Bad Vilbel 61118 / DE | 04 /
WULSTEN, Eva Cornelia Bonnenring 188 47877 Willich / DE | 05 /
BERTRAM, Ulrike Schönrathstraße 82 52066 Aachen / DE | 06 /
REINHOLD, Ulrich I. Rote-Haag Weg 44a 52076 Aachen / DE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2019/01] |
Former [2018/05] | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 16714327.0 | 23.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016EP56376 | Priority number, date | EP20150161487 | 27.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15161487 | EP20150169730 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15169730 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156147 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273953 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273953 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K9/08, A61K47/12, A61P25/04 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | A61K31/137, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILE FORMULIERUNG ZUR PARENTERALEN VERABREICHUNG VON TAPENTADOL | [2018/35] | English: | STABLE FORMULATION FOR PARENTERAL ADMINISTRATION OF TAPENTADOL | [2018/05] | French: | FORMULATION STABLE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION PARENTERALE DE TAPENTADOL | [2018/35] |
Former [2018/05] | STABILE FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR PARENTERALEN VERABREICHUNG VON TAPENTADOL | ||
Former [2018/05] | FORMULATION STABLE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION PARENTÉRALE DE TAPENTADOL | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18206581.3 / EP3479823 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2019/52] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2008110323 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-60 * page 15, line 14 - page 16, line 9; example 5 *; | [YD]WO2011071400 (TECNIMEDE SOCIEDADE TECNICO MEDICINAL S A [PT], et al) [YD] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [XDYI]WO2012119728 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-55 * page 4, line 17 - page 7, line 2 * * page 16, composition E7;; examples 1-6 * [Y] 1-60 [I] 56-60; | [Y]WO2012119727 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-60 * example 1 *; | [A] - TZSCHENTKE T M ET AL, "Tapentadol hydrochloride. Analgesic, Mu-opioid receptor agonist, noradrenaline reuptake inhibitor.", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (200612), vol. 31, no. 12, ISSN 0377-8282, pages 1053 - 1061, XP002660111 [A] 1-60 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0122998 | WO0193830 | WO02067651 | WO02072080 | WO03035053 | WO03041687 | WO2004062689 | WO2006002886 | US2007213405 | WO2007128412 | WO2007128413 | WO2008110323 | WO2008135601 | WO2009067703 | WO2009092601 | WO2009124586 | US2010272815 | WO2011071400 | WO2012119727 | WO2012119728 | WO2013144814 | - T.M. TZSCHENTKE ET AL., DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (2006), vol. 31, no. 12, pages 1053 - 1061 |