Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11230768 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2022 | B2 | US2018051377 | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102609181B | Global Dossier | 05.12.2023 | B1 | KR20170137174 | 12.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6745280B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B2 | JP2018512512 | 17.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107532305B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2020 | B | CN107532305 | 02.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2982487 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2023 | C | CA2982487 | 20.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3283666 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B1 | EP3283666 | 21.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017021948 | 10.07.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017012594 | 09.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | WO2016EP57220 | 01.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016165958 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015206812 | 20.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015206812 | 15.04.2015 |