|
23.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
13.09.2017 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
13.09.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
21.08.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
08.03.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.03.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2017 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
29.09.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
04.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |