08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
12.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
08.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.06.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
28.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
12.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
21.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
29.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|