Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10672411 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2020 | B2 | US2018033444 | 01.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102099293B | Global Dossier | 18.05.2020 | B1 | KR20170132854 | 04.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6626123B | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B2 | JP2018511086 | 19.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107710324B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2021 | B | CN107710324 | 16.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2983813 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2021 | C | CA2983813 | 13.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3281197 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP3281197 | 14.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017021424 | 09.01.2024 | B1 | BR112017021424 | 03.07.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2741009T | 07.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX366304 | 04.07.2019 | B | MX2017012804 | 30.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2707144 | 22.11.2019 | C2 | RU2017135436 | 08.04.2019 | A3 | RU2017135436 | 08.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP57514 | 06.04.2016 | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016162375 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3079151 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15163055 | 09.04.2015 |