EP3298689 - SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCKHAUS, Tim Meisenweg 8 71679 Asperg / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16715294.1 | 08.04.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016EP57693 | Priority number, date | DE201510209277 | 21.05.2015 Original published format: DE102015209277 | [2018/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016184605 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3298689 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03H1/02, H03H7/42, G05F3/08 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H03H1/02 (EP,US);
H03H7/06 (US);
G05F3/08 (EP,US);
H03H7/427 (EP,US);
H02P6/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | H03H1/02, H03H7/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND STEUEREINRICHTUNG | [2018/13] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2018/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 04.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.04.2021 | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 31.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 13.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]GB515843 (BAIRD TELEVISION LTD, et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 13 *; | [I]DE3804331 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [I] 1-10 * figure 3 *; | [XI]FR2653281 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * figure 2 * [I] 4,5,10; | [I] - KUMAR U ET AL, "A SURVEY OF DUAL INPUT RC NOTCH FILTERS", MICROELECTRONICS JOURNAL, MACKINTOSH PUBLICATIONS LTD. LUTON, GB, (19910201), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0026-2692(91)90041-K, ISSN 0026-2692, pages 31 - 47, XP000205220 [I] 1-10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0026-2692(91)90041-K | [A] - BISHAY A G ET AL, "Effect of strain on the frequency-dependent resistance of island gold films", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN ELECTRONICS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20060101), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10854-005-5144-5, ISSN 1573-482X, pages 71 - 77, XP019211907 [A] 1-10 * figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10854-005-5144-5 | by applicant | EP2837915 |