EP3259409 - SUCTION HEAD OF A DREDGING VESSEL AND METHOD FOR DREDGING USING SAID SUCTION HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baggerwerken Decloedt en Zoon N.V. Slijkensesteenweg 2 8400 Oostende / BE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACK, Bruno Vrijestraat 10 B9960 Assenede / BE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 16715344.4 | 17.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016IB50838 | Priority number, date | BE20150005089 | 18.02.2015 Original published format: BE 201505089 | [2017/52] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016132299 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259409 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259409 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/88, E02F3/92, E02F5/10, E21C50/00 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
E02F5/108 (EP);
E02F3/8875 (EP);
E02F3/9256 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGKOPF FÜR EIN BAGGERSCHIFF UND VERFAHREN ZUM BAGGERN MIT VERWENDUNG DES BESAGTEN SAUGKOPFS | [2017/52] | English: | SUCTION HEAD OF A DREDGING VESSEL AND METHOD FOR DREDGING USING SAID SUCTION HEAD | [2017/52] | French: | TÊTE D'ASPIRATION D'UN NAVIRE DE DRAGAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DRAGAGE UTILISANT LADITE TÊTE D'ASPIRATION | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 11.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2016 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | IT | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 17.02.2016 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
NO | 10.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4150502 (SIJTHOFF JAN PIET T [NL]) [X] 1,3,4,15 * figures 2,7,8 * [Y] 5 [I] 19; | [XY]EP0892116 (DREDGING INT [BE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-11,15,19 * figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [XAYI]AU2005200784 (DREDECO PTY LTD) [X] 1-4,6-10,14,15,19 * figures 4-7 * [A] 12,13,17,18 [Y] 5 [I] 16; | [X]US2014250742 (LAMOURIE PAUL C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10,15,19* figures 3-5 * | by applicant | EP0892116 |