Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11067664 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2020150213 | 14.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US23214 | 18.03.2016 | US202016746608 | 17.01.2020 | US201715558047 | 13.09.2017 | US201562139377 | 27.03.2015 | US201562139311 | 27.03.2015 | US201562151793 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10571547 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2020 | B2 | US2018067187 | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US23214 | 18.03.2016 | US201615558047 | 18.03.2016 | US201562139377 | 27.03.2015 | US201562139311 | 27.03.2015 | US201562151793 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3955661 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US23214 | 18.03.2016 | EP16715400 | 18.03.2016 | EP19155236 | 18.03.2016 | US201562139377 | 27.03.2015 | US201562139311 | 27.03.2015 | US201562151793 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3499989 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2021 | B1 | EP3499989 | 19.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US23214 | 18.03.2016 | EP16715400 | 18.03.2016 | US201562139377 | 27.03.2015 | US201562139311 | 27.03.2015 | US201562151793 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3275254 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2019 | B1 | EP3275254 | 31.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US23214 | 18.03.2016 | US201562139377 | 27.03.2015 | US201562139311 | 27.03.2015 | US201562151793 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016160376 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562139377 | 27.03.2015 | US201562139311 | 27.03.2015 | US201562151793 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Divisional application | EP3499989 | EP3955661 |