Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3285693 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP16716598 EP2016058406W US201615569054 US202217867578



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022346982Global Dossier 03.11.2022A1
Priority number Date
DE102015106389 24.04.2015
US202217867578 18.07.2022
WO2016EP58406 15.04.2016
US201715569054 24.10.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018133029Global Dossier 17.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
DE102015106389 24.04.2015
WO2016EP58406 15.04.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3285693Global Dossier 11.09.2019B8
EP3285693 07.08.2019B1
EP3285693 28.02.2018A1
Priority number Date
DE102015106389 24.04.2015
WO2016EP58406 15.04.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016169855Global Dossier 27.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE102015106389 24.04.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102015106389 10.11.2016B4
DE102015106389 27.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
DE102015106389 24.04.2015