EP3357294 - APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USER EQUIPMENT (UE) COVERAGE ENHANCEMENT LEVEL DEFINITION, SELECTION AND ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Inc. 4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIYANTO, Basuki Valthornsvägen 12 224 68 Lund / SE | 02 /
TRANG, Linh Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | 03 /
LJUNG, Rickard Tingsgatan 13 256 56 Helsingborg / SE | 04 /
BERGGREN, Anders Luntvagen 6 226 49 Lund / SE | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
PRIYANTO, Basuki Valthornsvägen 12 SE-224 68 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
TRANG, Linh Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
LJUNG, Rickard Tingsgatan 13 256 56 Helsingborg / SE | |||
04 /
BERGGREN, Anders Luntvagen 6 226 49 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Neij & Lindberg AB Pedellgatan 11 224 60 Lund / SE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16716746.9 | 29.03.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016US24743 | Priority number, date | US201562236623P | 02.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562236623 P | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017058283 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357294 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3357294 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W16/24, H04W4/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W16/24 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W74/0866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | H04W74/08, H04W4/00, H04W16/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEFINITION, AUSWAHL UND ZUORDNUNG VON BENUTZERGERÄTEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ABDECKUNGSEBENE | [2018/32] | English: | APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USER EQUIPMENT (UE) COVERAGE ENHANCEMENT LEVEL DEFINITION, SELECTION AND ALLOCATION | [2018/32] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉFINITION, LA SÉLECTION ET L'ATTRIBUTION DE NIVEAU D'AMÉLIORATION DE COUVERTURE D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 16.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2016 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | IE | 29.03.2022 | LU | 29.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.03.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 29.03.2022 | ||
LU | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2015042866 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2015117233 (WONG SHIN HORNG [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] *; | [X]WO2015116870 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0130] *; | [X] - KDDI CORPORATION, "Discussion on configuration of coverage enhancement level", vol. RAN WG1, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20150525 - 20150529, (20150524), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-153152_MTC_CE_V2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150524), XP050972451 [X] 1-4 * page 2, section Uplink coverage enhancement", e.g.: "It is also possible that the CE UE autonomously changes its coverage enhancement level and it does not notify that fact. In such cases, inconsistency between knowledge at UEs and eNBs occurs. ..." * | [XP] - SONY, "Considerations on PRACH resources for NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG2, no. Budapest, HU; 20160119 - 20160121, (20160118), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-160484 - NBIOT PRACH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160118), XP051054771 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [XP] - INTERDIGITAL, "Remaining open issues related to Random Access", vol. RAN WG2, no. Anaheim, US; 20151116 - 20151120, (20151116), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-156622_LC_MTC RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20151116), XP051005988 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * | [XP] - NOKIA NETWORKS, "Random access procedure for enhanced coverage UEs", vol. RAN WG2, no. Anaheim, USA; 20151116 - 20151120, (20151116), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-156445 MTC RA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20151116), XP051005858 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | US2014098761 |