EP3417482 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE HAVING A SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPELKE, Martin Rosenaustr. 10 90429 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
SUDA, Manfred Sandstr. 24 91334 Hemhofen / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 16716841.8 | 06.04.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016EP57519 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017174126 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417482 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/11, H02M5/45, H02J3/00, H02M7/00, H02M7/19 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H01L25/112 (EP,US);
H01L25/165 (US);
H02M7/155 (EP,US);
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE EINRICHTUNG MIT EINER HALBLEITERSCHALTUNG | [2018/52] | English: | ELECTRICAL DEVICE HAVING A SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUIT | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉ D'UN CIRCUIT À SEMICONDUCTEURS | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 13.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3878448 (JACKSON PER-OLOF, et al) [Y] 9 * column 1, lines 38-59 *; | [Y]US4218731 (KUEHNEL WERNER [DE]) [Y] 8,10 * column 1, lines 36-54 - pages 1,2, paragraph 1 *; | [AD]EP0299275 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XYI]DE19841134 (ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 20 - pages 1-4, column 3, line 48 * [Y] 8-10 [I] 6,11 | by applicant | EP0299275 |