EP3207658 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COORDINATED RADIO RESOURCE ASSIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELSCHNER, Jakob Fichardstrasse 7a 60322 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
ARNOLD, Paul Butzbacher Strasse 44 60389 Frankfurt/m. / DE | 03 /
RAMOS-CANTOR, Oscar D. Einumer Str. 74 31135 Hildesheim / DE | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/34] | 01 /
BELSCHNER, Jakob Fichardstrasse 7a 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
ARNOLD, Paul Butzbacher Strasse 44 60389 Frankfurt/m. / DE | |||
03 /
RAMOS-CANTOR, Oscar D. Marktplatz 14 64283 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 16717261.8 | 22.03.2016 | [2017/34] | WO2016EP56268 | Priority number, date | EP20150160272 | 23.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15160272 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016150967 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3207658 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3207658 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
H04L5/0035 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0058 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/336 (US);
H04W88/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | H04L5/00, H04B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOORDINIERTEN ZUWEISUNG VON FUNKRESSOURCEN | [2018/13] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COORDINATED RADIO RESOURCE ASSIGNMENT | [2017/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ALLOCATION COORDONNÉE DES RESSOURCES RADIO | [2018/13] |
Former [2017/34] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOORDINIERTEN FUNKRESSOURCENZUWEISUNG | ||
Former [2017/34] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ATTRIBUTION COORDONNÉE DE RESSOURCES RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2016 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | IE | 22.03.2019 | LU | 22.03.2019 | MT | 22.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
MT | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
MT | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
MT | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2015063222 (WANG XIAOYI [US], et al); | by applicant | US2012027108 | US2015063222 |