EP3277308 - GLUTAMATE OXALOACETATE TRANSAMINASE 1 (GOT1), PREPARATIONS AND METHODS OF GENERATING SAME AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co., Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRELMAN, David 5 Harduf Street 5296000 Ramat-Efal / IL | 02 /
RABINKOV, Aharon c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
RUBAN, Angela c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
JONA, Ghil c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 05 /
HAZUM, Eli c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 06 /
BUMELIS, Vladas c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 07 /
MAKAUSKAS, Nerijus c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 08 /
SUDZIUVIENE, Saule c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 09 /
NARMONTAITE, Elena c/o Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16717478.8 | 31.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016IL50346 | Priority number, date | US201562140492P | 31.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562140492 P | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016157190 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277308 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/45, C12N9/10, C12N15/62 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
A61K38/45 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/1096 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K1/165 (KR);
C07K1/18 (KR);
C07K1/303 (KR);
C07K1/36 (KR);
C12Y206/01001 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Title | German: | GLUTAMATOXALOACETATTRANSAMINASE 1 (GOT1), ZUBEREITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/06] | English: | GLUTAMATE OXALOACETATE TRANSAMINASE 1 (GOT1), PREPARATIONS AND METHODS OF GENERATING SAME AND USES THEREOF | [2018/06] | French: | GLUTAMATE OXALOACÉTATE TRANSAMINASE 1 (GOT1), PRÉPARATIONS, PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION DES PRÉPARATIONS ET UTILISATIONS DES PRÉPARATIONS | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 16.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1493750 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-5 * claim 23; table 2; sequence 149 * [Y] 19-26; | [Y]WO2006069610 (METANOMICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 7-18,29,30,33-36 * page 2973; table IIa; sequence 54831 * * paragraph [0282.0.0.0] * * paragraph [0310.0.0.0] *; | [Y]EP2561889 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [Y] 19-21,25 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO2008083271 (LIFESENSORS INC [US], et al) [X] 6,27,28,31,32 * figures 1,7; claims 1-7,19; sequence 63 * * page 1, lines 14-17 * * page 4, lines 1-2 *; | [X]WO2012159782 (CT DE INVESTIGACION COOPERATIVA EN BIOCIENCIAS CIC BIOGUNE ASOC [ES], et al) [X] 6,27,28,31,32 * figure 1; claims 1,8,33,34 * * page 14, lines 7-9 *; | [X]WO2008140582 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [X] 6,27,28,31,32 * claims 1-5 * * page 2, lines 1-3 *; | [XY] - MARBLESTONE JEFFREY G ET AL, "Comparison of SUMO fusion technology with traditional gene fusion systems: Enhanced expression and solubility with SUMO", PROTEIN SCIENCE, WILEY, US, (20060101), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1110/PS.051812706, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 182 - 189, XP002500201 [X] 6,27 * abstract * [Y] 7-18,29,30,33-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/PS.051812706 | [Y] - DOYLE J M ET AL, "THE AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF CYTOSOLIC ASPARTATE AMINOTRANSFERASE FROM HUMAN LIVER", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS LTD, GB, (19900915), vol. 270, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 651 - 657, XP008006437 [Y] 8,14,19-26 * abstract * | [Y] - ANGELA RUBAN ET AL, "MRS of Brain Metabolite Levels Demonstrates the Ability of Scavenging of Excess Brain Glutamate to Protect against Nerve Agent Induced Seizures", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES 2012 MDPI AG CHE, (20150202), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.3390/ijms16023226, ISSN 1661-6596, pages 3226 - 3236, XP055276612 [Y] 22-24,26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms16023226 | [A] - "Human GOT1 Recombinant protein (GST tag)", (2014), URL: http://www.novoprolabs.com/p/human-got1-recombinant-protein-gst-tag-508388.html, (20160530), XP002758238 [A] 7-18,29,30,33-36 * the whole document * | [A] - TANAKA-HAYASHI AYUMI ET AL, "Isd-aspartate produced by glutamic-oxaloacetic transaminase-1 like 1 (Got1l1): a putative aspartate racemase?", AMINO ACIDS, SPRINGER VERLAG, AU, vol. 47, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00726-014-1847-3, ISSN 0939-4451, (20141007), pages 79 - 86, (20141007), XP035418067 [A] 7-18,29,30,33-36 * page 81, column 1, line 49 - page 81, column 2, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00726-014-1847-3 | by applicant | US2010021987 | US5464764 | US5487992 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | US4879219 | US5011771 | US5281521 | - RUBAN A ET AL., INVEST NEW DRUGS, (2012), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 2226 - 2235 | - F. CAMPOS ET AL., JOURNAL OF CEREB. BLOOD FLOW METABOL., (2011), vol. 31, page 1387 | - M. PEREZ-MATO ET AL., CELL DEATH & DIS., (2014), vol. 5, page E992 | - PRAKASH ET AL., MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (2012), vol. 11, page 92 | - MARBLESTONE ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (200601), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 182 - 189 | - JM, DOYLE ET AL., "The amino acid sequence of cytosolic aspartate aminotransferase from human liver.", BIOCHEM. J., (1990), vol. 270, pages 651 - 7, XP008006437 | - SROUR, M.A. ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (2003), vol. 90, pages 398 - 405 | - GILBOA, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 504 - 512 | - S HJERTEN, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1964), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 393 - 398 | - R ARSHADY, "Styrene based polymer supports developed by suspension polymerization", CHIMICA E L'INDUSTRIA, (1988), vol. 70, no. 9, pages 70 - 75 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, EASTON, PA, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - FINGL ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page 1 | - WEISSENBERGER ET AL., J. NEUROSURG, (200704), vol. 106, no. 4, pages 652 - 9 | - GUHA ET AL., AM J PATHOL., (200509), vol. 167, no. 3, pages 859 - 67 | - REILLY ET AL., NAT. GENET., (200009), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 109 - 13 | - UHRBOM ET AL., NAT. MED., (200411), vol. 10, no. 11, pages 1257 - 60 | - "Chapter 52", PAUL CALABRESI; BRUCE A. CHABNER, Antineoplastic Agents | - GOODMAN; GILMAN'S, The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, INC., (1990), pages 1202 - 1263 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (1994), vol. I-III | - WATSON ET AL., Recombinant DNA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN BOOKS | - Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1998), vol. 1-4 | - Cell Biology: A Laboratory Handbook, (1994), vol. I-III | - Current Protocols in Immunology, (1994), vol. I-III | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 1-317 | - KARMEN A; WROBLEWSKI F; LA DUE JS., "Transaminase activity in human blood", J CLIN INVEST, (1955), vol. 34, pages 126 - 31 | - WADA H; SNE L E., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1961), vol. 236, no. 7, pages 2089 - 95 |