EP3253767 - PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF DOLUTE-GRAVIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mylan Laboratories Ltd. Plot No. 564/A/22 Road No. 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELLANKI, Sivaram Prasad Mylan Laboratories Ltd Plot No 564/A/22 Road No 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | 02 /
NADELLA, Madumurthy Mylan Laboratories Ltd Plot No 564/A/22 Road No 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | 03 /
BHALME, Mitali Mylan Laboratories Ltd Plot No 564/A/22 Road No 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | 04 /
RAMABHOTLA, Revathi Srinivas Mylan Laboratories Ltd Plot No 564/A/22 Road No 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | 05 /
ARUMALLA, Venkata Siva Reddy Mylan Laboratories Ltd Plot No 564/A/22 Road No 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | 06 /
KILARU, Raveendra Babu Mylan Laboratories Ltd Plot No 564/A/22 Road No 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | Cooke, Richard Spencer Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16717714.6 | 05.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016IN50046 | Priority number, date | IN2015CHE588 | 06.02.2015 Original published format: IN 588CH2015 | IN2015CHE4137 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: IN 4137CH2015 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016125192 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3253767 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/14, C07F5/04, C07C229/30 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
C07D498/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5365 (KR);
C07C227/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07C229/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/10, C07C229/30 (EP,US);
C07C227/18, C07C229/30 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | 06.09.2017 | ME | 06.09.2017 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DOLUTEGRAVIR | [2017/50] | English: | PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF DOLUTE-GRAVIR | [2017/50] | French: | PROCEDES POUR LA PREPARATION DE DOLUTE-GRAVIR | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 06.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2020/03] | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011119566 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-28,33-37 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2444400 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [A] 1-28,33-36* paragraph [0492] - paragraph [0506]; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2015001572 (HETERO RESEARCH FOUNDATION [IN], et al) [A] 1-28,35,36 * schemes 1, 2;; examples 9-19; claims 1-13 * | by applicant | WO2006116764 | WO2011119566 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 |