EP3265596 - METAL MATRIX COMPOSITE GRANULES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Materion Corporation 6070 Parkland Blvd. Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARRANT, Andrew D. 6070 Parkland Boulevard Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 02 /
TRICKER, Nicholas David 6070 Parkland Boulevard Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 03 /
CAMPBELL, Jeffrey R. 6070 Parkland Boulevard Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 04 /
HONEY, Nicholas J. 6070 Parkland Boulevard Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 05 /
POKROSS, Charles 6070 Parkland Boulevard Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | 06 /
SMITH, Tahsina 6070 Parkland Boulevard Mayfield Heights, Ohio 44124 / US | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16718531.3 | 03.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016US20645 | Priority number, date | US201562127444P | 03.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562127444 P | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016141160 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265596 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C22C32/00 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
C22C32/00 (EP,US);
B22F1/052 (EP,US);
B22F3/04 (US);
B22F3/17 (US);
B22F3/20 (US);
B22F9/04 (US);
C22C21/00 (US);
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22C21/16 (EP,US);
B22F2003/175 (US);
B22F2003/208 (US);
B22F2301/052 (US);
B22F2302/10 (US);
B22F2302/105 (US);
B22F2302/20 (US);
B22F2302/25 (US);
B22F2302/253 (US);
B22F2304/10 (US);
B22F2304/15 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
C22C32/0036 (EP,US);
C22C32/0063 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F9/04, B22F3/17 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F9/04, B22F3/20 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | METALLMATRIXVERBUNDGRANULATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/02] | English: | METAL MATRIX COMPOSITE GRANULES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2018/02] | French: | GRANULES COMPOSITES À MATRICE MÉTALLIQUE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 30.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2020 | 01.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 18.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - Anonymous, "AMC225XE PARTICLE REINFORCED ALUMINUM ALLOY", (20120101), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20140703031705/http://materion.com/~/media/Files/PDFs/Aerospace Metal Composites/Materion AMC 225XE 2012.pdf, (20160524), XP055275034 [X] 1-6,8-14,17-20 * the whole document * [I] 15,16 | [XI] - Anonymous, "AMC640XA PARTICLE REINFORCED ALUMINUM ALLOY", (20120101), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20140807181602/http://materion.com/~/media/Files/PDFs/Aerospace Metal Composites/Materion AMC640xa Brochure 2012, (20160525), XP055275192 [X] 1-5,7-14,17-20 * the whole document * [I] 15,16 | [A] - J. J. Dunkley, "Advances in atomisation techniques for the formation of metal powders", Advances in Powder Metallurgy : Properties, Processing and Applications, Woodhead Publishing, (20130801), pages 3 - 18, doi:10.1533/9780857098900.1.3, XP055274980 [A] 1-20 * section 1.1.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1533/9780857098900.1.3 | [A] - BONOLLO F ET AL, "The effect of quenching on the mechanical properties of powder metallurgically produced Al@?SiC (particles) metal matrix composites", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS: PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURES AND PROCESSING, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 144, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/0921-5093(91)90237-H, ISSN 0921-5093, (19911001), pages 303 - 309, (19911001), XP024169543 [A] 15,16 * abstract * * section 2 * * tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-5093(91)90237-H |