EP3283570 - METHOD FOR INHIBITING THE PERMEATION OF WATER IN AN EXTRACTION WELL OF A HYDROCARBON FLUID FROM AN UNDERGROUND RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eni S.p.A. Piazzale E. Mattei 1 00144 Roma / IT | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL GAUDIO, Lucilla Via Trieste 16 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | 02 /
LOREFICE, Roberto Via Melegnano 20070 Vizzolo Predabissi (MI) / IT | 03 /
MORBIDELLI, Massimo Silvio Via San Carlo 66 14030 Rocca d'Arazzo (AT) / IT | 04 /
MOSCATELLI, Davide Via Gran Paradiso 20 20020 Arese (MI) / IT | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16718912.5 | 13.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016IB52089 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB00067 | 13.04.2015 Original published format: IT UB20150067 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016166672 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283570 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3283570 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/06, E21B33/00, E21B43/00, C09K8/50, C08F220/06, C08F220/56, C08L33/26 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
C08F220/06 (EP,EA,US);
C08L33/02 (EA,US);
C08L33/06 (EP,EA,US);
C09K8/502 (EP,EA,US);
E21B43/00 (EP,EA,US);
E21B43/16 (EA,US);
C08F220/286 (EP,EA,US);
C08F220/56 (EP,EA,US);
C08F2800/20 (EA,US);
C08L2201/52 (EA,US);
C08L2201/56 (EA,US);
C08L33/26 (EP,EA,US);
C09K2208/10 (EP,EA,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L33/06, C08F220/06, C08F220/286 (US,EP);
C08L33/06, C08F220/06, C08F220/56 (US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG DER PERMEATION VON WASSER IN EINEM EXTRAKTIONSBOHRLOCH EINER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFFLÜSSIGKEIT AUS EINEM UNTERIRDISCHEN RESERVOIR | [2018/08] | English: | METHOD FOR INHIBITING THE PERMEATION OF WATER IN AN EXTRACTION WELL OF A HYDROCARBON FLUID FROM AN UNDERGROUND RESERVOIR | [2018/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INHIBITION DE LA PERMÉATION DE L'EAU DANS UN PUITS D'EXTRACTION D'UN FLUIDE HYDROCARBONÉ À PARTIR D'UN RÉSERVOIR SOUTERRAIN | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 12.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2016 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | IE | 13.04.2021 | LU | 13.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 13.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4182417 (GIVENS STEVEN P [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * columns 1,3-4,6 *; | [XY]WO2012013877 (SEPPIC SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,10-15 * the whole document * * page 3, line 17 - line 27 *[Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2012090153 (ENI SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012261120 (DEL GAUDIO LUCILLA [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0018] - [0032] - [0040] - [0060]; example 1 * | by applicant | US3965986 | WO2012090153 | - SAENZ, JM; ASUA, JM, "Dispersion polymerization in polar-solvents", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART A-POLYMER CHEMISTRY | - SAENZ, JM; ASUA, JM, "Dispersion copolymerization of styrene and butyl acrylate in polar solvents", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART A-POLYMER CHEMISTRY | - VIVALDOLIMA, E; WOOD, PE; HAMIELEC, AE; PENLIDIS, A, "An updated review on suspension polymerization", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH | - ZOHURIAAN-MEHR, MJ; KABIRI, K, "Superabsorbent polymer materials: A review", IRANIAN POLYMER JOURNAL |