EP3283890 - ULTRASONIC ANEMOMETER AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE COMPONENT OF A WIND SPEED VECTOR OR THE SOUND SPEED IN THE ATMOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METEK Meteorologische Messtechnik GmbH Fritz-Straßmann-Str. 4 25337 Elmshorn / DE | [2020/42] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Metek Meteorologische Messtechnik GmbH Fritz-Strassmann-Strasse 4 25337 Elmshorn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERS, Gerhard Kleiberweg 132 22547 Hamburg / DE | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Heinemeyer, Karsten Advlnno Patent-u. Rechtsanwaltspart. mbB Heinemeyer & Joachim Sandstrasse 17-23 23552 Lübeck / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16719775.5 | 12.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016EP25034 | Priority number, date | DE20151004408 | 12.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015004408 | DE20151013399 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: DE102015013399 | [2018/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016165836 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283890 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3283890 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/24 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G01P5/245 (EP,US);
G01F1/667 (US);
G01P13/02 (US);
G01P5/08 (US);
G01P5/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLWINDMESSER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG WENIGSTENS EINER KOMPONENTE EINES WINDGESCHWINDIGKEITSVEKTORS ODER DER SCHALLGESCHWINDIGKEIT IN DER ATMOSPHÄRE | [2018/08] | English: | ULTRASONIC ANEMOMETER AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE COMPONENT OF A WIND SPEED VECTOR OR THE SOUND SPEED IN THE ATMOSPHERE | [2018/08] | French: | ANÉMOMÈTRE ULTRASONORE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTERMINATION D'AU MOINS UNE COMPOSANTE D'UN VECTEUR DE VITESSE DU VENT OU DE LA VITESSE DU SON DANS L'ATMOSPHÈRE | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 12.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2016 | AL | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.04.2016 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 02.06.2021 | |
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | HR | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 02.06.2021 | |
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 02.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3633415 (LUCE JOHN W) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * column 4, line 12 - line 59 * * column 5, line 11 - line 20 * * figures 2, 3 * [I] 2,3,5-13; | [XI]US5343744 (AMMANN STEPHEN K [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 10 - line 17 * * column 2, line 50 - line 62 * * figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5-13; | [A]DE2911704 (ME MEERESTECHNIK ELEKTRONIK GM) [A] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 10 - page 11 * | by applicant | DE68901800T |