EP3426157 - EXTERNAL ULTRASOUND GENERATING TREATING DEVICE FOR SPINAL CORD AND SPINAL NERVES TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/03] | EXTERNAL ULTRASOUND GENERATING TREATING DEVICE FOR SPINAL CORD AND SPINAL NERVES TREATMENT, APPARATUS COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE AND METHOD IMPLEMENTING SUCH DEVICE | ||
[2021/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SORBONNE UNIVERSITE 21, rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states ASSISTANCE PUBLIQUE - HÔPITAUX DE PARIS 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | [2022/07] |
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states SORBONNE UNIVERSITE 21 rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states ASSISTANCE PUBLIQUE - HÔPITAUX DE PARIS 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPENTIER, Alexandre 37 Rue Cortambert F-75116 Paris / FR | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51 avenue Jean Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 16719897.7 | 11.03.2016 | [2019/03] | WO2016IB00431 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153799 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426157 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3426157 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61N7/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A61N7/00 (EP,US);
A61B8/0875 (EP,US);
A61B8/4477 (EP,US);
A61B8/481 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0026 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0078 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0091 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERNE ULTRASCHALLERZEUGENDE BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKENMARKSBEHANDLUNG UND RÜCKENMARKSNERVENBEHANDLUNG | [2021/25] | English: | EXTERNAL ULTRASOUND GENERATING TREATING DEVICE FOR SPINAL CORD AND SPINAL NERVES TREATMENT | [2021/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT EXTERNE GÉNÉRANT DES ULTRASONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MOELLE ÉPINIÈRE ET DES NERFS RACHIDIENS | [2021/25] |
Former [2019/03] | EXTERNE ULTRASCHALLERZEUGENDE BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKENMARKS UND RÜCKENMARKSNERVENBEHANDLUNG, EINRICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/03] | EXTERNAL ULTRASOUND GENERATING TREATING DEVICE FOR SPINAL CORD AND SPINAL NERVES TREATMENT, APPARATUS COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE AND METHOD IMPLEMENTING SUCH DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/03] | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT EXTERNE GÉNÉRANT DES ULTRASONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MOELLE ÉPINIÈRE ET DES NERFS RACHIDIENS, APPAREIL COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 03.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2016 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | IE | 11.03.2022 | LU | 11.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.03.2016 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.03.2016 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 11.03.2022 | ||
LU | 11.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3150513 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V [DE]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0111386 (UNIV ABERDEEN [GB], et al) [X] 1,13 * page 10, line 19 - page 12, line 8 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 12 * * figures 1-2, 7 *; | [IY]US4836191 (NOSKE ERICH [DE], et al) [I] 1-5,7,13 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8-12,14; | [X]US5501655 (ROLT KENNETH D [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 34 * * figure 3 *; | [X]EP0872262 (SCANDIMED INTERNATIONAL AB [SE]) [X] 1,13 * sentence 12, paragraph 3 - sentence 14, paragraph 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0078232 (TRANSURGICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 20 * * page 7, lines 6-14 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 19 * * page 20, line 29 - page 21, line 7 ** figures 1-2, 4, 10 *; | [Y]WO0243805 (INSIGHTEC TXSONICS LTD [IL]) [Y] 8-12 * page 11, lines 1-7 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 11 * * figures 1a-c, 2 *; | [Y]WO2007026299 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 6,14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0031] * * figures 1-2 *; | [I]US2008221490 (ZAHOS PETER A [US]) [I] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [XDYI]US2016016012 (YOUN INCHAN [KR], et al) [XD] 1,13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 37] , [0 39] - [0045] - [0 77] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,8,11,12,14 [I] 7 | by applicant | EP0643982 | WO9639079 | US6319241 | WO03059437 | WO03061756 | US2005020945 | US6862479 | US2005240170 | US2007073135 | EP1774989 | WO2007124458 | JP2007289715 | US2008287837 | GR20070100349 | US2013178765 | US2013281890 | US8942781 | US8977361 | US2015224345 | US2015231417 | US2016001096 | US2016016012 |